FL H0627 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes municipalities & counties to further restrict smoking within boundaries of certain public parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of Smoking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Health Quality Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S562 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
386209Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback