FL H0625 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes sheriffs to sue to enjoin alleged nuisances; revises notice requirements for filing of temporary injunctions relating to enjoinment of nuisances; extends time period of notice before lien may attach to real estate; declares use of location by certain persons is public nuisance; declares that any place or premises that has been used on more than two occasions during certain time period as site of specified violations is nuisance; provides opportunity to remedy nuisance; prohibits rental property from being abated or subject to forfeiture.
Title
Public Nuisances
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Wengay Newton [D] | Rep. Stan McClain [R] |
Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#647 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#647 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-130 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 888 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Rules |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Rules |
2020-03-10 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-10 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/26/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-14 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-13 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-02 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-02 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-02 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-01-31 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-30 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S888 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 625
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
823 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |