FL H0623 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides legislative findings & intent; provides that certain emergency health care providers are agents of state for purposes of sovereign immunity when acting pursuant to specified statutory obligations; requires certain indemnity for state from providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Health Care Providers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 55
2011-02-22 Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 55
2011-02-07 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback