FL H0617 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
Pending: House Government Operations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from public meetings requirements that portion of Statewide Council on Human Trafficking direct-support organization during which personal identifying information of donor or prospective donor is discussed; exempts from public records requirements personal identifying information of donor or prospective donor to direct-support organization who desires to remain anonymous; provides for legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec. and Meetings/Statewide Council on Human Trafficking Direct-support Organization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-18 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-01-18HouseReported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-18HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseAdded to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-06HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-11-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H615 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
S294 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16618Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback