FL H0611 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides no points will be assessed for violations of community sanctions that are resolved under an alternative sanctioning program; provides for resolution of low-risk violations of probation through an alternative sanctioning program; corrects provisions concerning limiting prison sentences for first time revocations for technical violations; provides for structured sentences when technical violations result in prison terms; provides time periods for hearing & release of probationer or offender concerning alleged violations that are criminal traffic offenses or technical violations; provides that an alternative sanctioning program is default method for resolution of certain low-risk violations.
Title
Criminal Sentencing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-06 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1138 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/611 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/611/BillText/Filed/PDF |