FL H0609 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that court costs for all adoptive parents who adopt children in custody of DCF be waived rather than reimbursed by department.
Title
Adoption Assistance for Children within the Child Welfare System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S918 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/609 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/609/BillText/Filed/PDF |