FL H0607 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Chapter No. 2020-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a licensed home health agency that authorizes a registered nurse to delegate tasks to a certified nursing assistant or a home health aide to ensure that certain requirements are met; requiring home health aides to complete annual inservice training in medication administration and medication error prevention, in addition to existing annual inservice training requirements; creating the Excellence in Home Health Program and the Nurse Registry Excellence Program, respectively, within the agency for a specified purpose; requiring the agency to adopt rules establishing program criteria, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct Care Workers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#691 (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#567 (Y: 94 N: 12 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Chapter No. 2020-9
2020-03-11 Approved by Governor
2020-03-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 8
2020-03-11HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (707914)
2020-03-11HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-11SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 30 NAYS 10
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10SenateAmendment(s) adopted (707914)
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1676
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2020-03-06SenateReceived
2020-03-06SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-03-06SenateIn Messages
2020-03-06HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 94 NAYS 12
2020-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-05HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (192181)
2020-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-02-26HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-26HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-15HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-15HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-12-18HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-12-16HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-12-11HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2019-12-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7017 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H471 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S584 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
H7053 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1676 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 607
H211 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 344 passed
S344 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-73
H1205 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S116 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
S1556 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1179

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100620Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100965Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200848Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100593Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397679Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976793Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009974Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009976Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009979Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42926Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429918Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627357Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7442006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
744331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7443675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
768135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98503Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607/Amendment/511213/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607/Vote/HouseVote_h00607e1567.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607/Vote/SenateVote_h00607e1004.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/607/Vote/HouseVote_h00607e1691.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback