FL H0605 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 950 (Ch. 2021-180)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 950 (Ch. 2021-180)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & provides requirements for driver of motor vehicle overtaking bicycle or other nonmotorized vehicle or electric bicycle; requires DHSMV to provide annual awareness & safety campaign; revises requirements for turning at intersections; revises & provides requirements for persons riding bicycles in groups; requires Class E driver license examination to address bicycle & pedestrian safety.
Title
Bicycle and Pedestrian Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 950 (Ch. 2021-180) |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-19 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-30 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-24 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-23 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S950 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-180
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |