FL H0605 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 952 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that participation in Senior Management Service Class of FRS is compulsory for certain persons on specified date; authorizes members of such class to purchase & upgrade certain retirement credit; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senior Management Service Class

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseLaid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 952 passed
2020-02-20HouseReferred to- Calendar
2020-02-20HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: State Affairs Committee
2020-02-19HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2020-02-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-18HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/18/20, 11:30 am, Webster Hall
2020-01-30HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2020-01-29HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-29HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-29HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2020-01-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S952 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-120

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback