FL H0595 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying & location information of chair, commissioners, & hearing officers of Public Employees Relations Commission & personal identifying & location information of spouses & children of such personnel; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Public Employees Relations Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-06 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S818 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/595 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/595/BillText/Filed/PDF |