FL H0595 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 616
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 616
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & provides requirements relating to advertising, demonstrating, & offering motor vehicles for sale or lease; specifies unfair trade practices & prohibited acts; revises & provides requirements for license renewal, continuing education, & industry certification.
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealers
Sponsors
House Government Accountability Committee | House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee | Rep. Bob Rommel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 616 |
2018-03-06 | House | Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 616 |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18 |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time 688 |
2018-02-27 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-26 | House | CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-02-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-01-24 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2018-01-16 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-11 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-09 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 321 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-11-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S616 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages