FL H0593 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chapter No. 2019-124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certain Florida College System institutions serving counties directly impacted by hurricane to waive out-of-state fees for students for specified time period; provides reporting requirements; provides that students enrolled under such fee waivers may not be included in certain enrollment totals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary Fee Waivers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#131 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25 Chapter No. 2019-124
2019-06-24 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-30HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-30SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1164
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HouseCS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-11HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-04-03HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-04-02HouseCS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-04-01HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-01HouseCS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/01/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-06HouseNow in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-06HouseFavorable by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-01-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1164 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 593 (Ch. 2019-124)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100926Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback