FL H0589 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Increases threshold amounts for certain theft offenses; revises circumstances under certain offenses by person with prior convictions constitute a higher degree felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Theft Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied on Calendar
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-04HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-04-04HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-03HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 2
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-07HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-07HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-06HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-05HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S406 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1334 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S7072 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback