FL H0585 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - CS passed as amended; YEAS 93 NAYS 20
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes counties imposing a tourist development tax to use tax revenues for specified purposes; provides criteria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourist Development Tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#604 (Y: 93 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 93 NAYS 20
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseAmendment(s) adopted (246187, 630329)
2018-02-14HouseAmendment(s) failed (865275) 574
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-05HouseCS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2018-02-05HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-01HouseCS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 6
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/01/18, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-18HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2018-01-17HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 4
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 01/17/18, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-10HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2018-01-10HouseFavorable by Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee
2017-11-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S658 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Now in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1250104Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/Amendment/563199/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/Amendment/457077/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/Amendment/100567/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/Amendment/630329/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/Amendment/232015/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/Amendment/865275/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/Amendment/246187/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/Amendment/759597/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/585/Vote/HouseVote_h00585c1604.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback