FL H0583 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-207
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-207
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exception to prohibitions on interception & recording of communications when communication is received in violation of specified injunction or order; limits use of intercepted communication to evidencing violation of specified injunction or order.
Title
Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications Made in Violation of Protective Orders
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. Kamia Brown [D] |
Sen. Tracie Davis [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Fetterhoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#46 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#136 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#136 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Chapter No. 2021-207 | |
2021-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1802 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-24 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-03-09 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1802 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 583 (Ch. 2021-207)