FL H0579 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that specified actions taken by business during declared emergencies may not be used as evidence in certain civil causes of action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Evidentiary Standards for Actions Arising During an Emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#110 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Rules
2021-04-20SenateReceived
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Rules
2021-04-15SenateIn Messages
2021-04-15HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-14HousePassed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
2021-04-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-13HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
2021-03-29HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-29HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-03-29HouseReported out of Judiciary Committee
2021-03-29HouseFavorable by Judiciary Committee
2021-03-25HouseAdded to Judiciary Committee agenda
2021-03-24HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2021-03-24HouseReported out of Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-03-24HouseFavorable by Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-03-22HouseAdded to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee agenda
2021-03-12HouseNow in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-03-12HouseReported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-03-12HouseFavorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-03-10HouseAdded to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-18HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-01-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S882 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
448111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/579
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/579/BillText/Filed/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/579/Analyses/h0579.CIV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/579/Analyses/h0579a.CIV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/579/Analyses/h0579b.PPE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/579/Analyses/h0579c.PPE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/579/Analyses/h0579d.JDC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/579/Analyses/h0579e.JDC.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/579/Vote/HouseVote_h00579__110.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58258&IsPCB=0&BillId=70891
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59207&IsPCB=0&BillId=70891
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59468&IsPCB=0&BillId=70891

Bill Comments 750

feedback