FL H0579 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8-2)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes University of Miami & its affiliates to establish sterile needle and syringe exchange pilot programs in Broward & Palm Beach Counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Infectious Disease Elimination Pilot Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied on Calendar
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2018-02-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
2018-02-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/27/18, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-26HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-26HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-26HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-25HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-24HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-11-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S800 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H945 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S1320 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810038Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback