FL H0573 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides fiduciary duties of public officials & executive officers; requires governmental entity to notify certain public officials & executive officers of board governance training by specified date; provides minimum board governance training requirements; provides governmental entities may offer required training through in-house counsel; provides which entities may provide training; requires specified vote for appointment of certain persons; provides standards for legal counsel & lobbyists employed by governmental entity; requires governing body to vote relating to certain expenditures; prohibits private cause of action.
Title
Fiduciary Duty of Care for Appointed Public Officials and Executive Officers
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Public Integrity and Elections Committee | Rep. Mike Beltran [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#282 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-23 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-23 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Amendment 594739 adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Amendment 594739 filed |
2021-04-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021) |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-04-01 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-22 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-19 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with CS by Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Added to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S758 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations