FL H0573 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes physician assistants & ARNPs to execute certificate under certain conditions stating that they have examined a person & find person appears to meet criteria for involuntary examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Involuntary Examinations Under the Baker Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#645 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-28SenateReceived
2018-02-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2018-02-28SenateIn Messages
2018-02-21HousePassed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2
2018-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-07HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/07/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-30HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-30HouseFavorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-11HouseNow in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
2018-01-11HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-11-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S112 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394496Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3949085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7442007Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback