FL H0573 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires facility providing mental health services to authorize access to patient by domestic partner; establishes requirements for domestic partnership; identifies rights afforded to domestic partners; provides for termination of domestic partnership; authorizes domestic partner to serve as health care proxy.
Title
Domestic Partners
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0854 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 508 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
872 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/573 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0573/BillText/Filed/PDF |