FL H0573 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-55
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Deletes requirements that physician assistants file evidence of certain clinical experience before prescribing or dispensing medication; authorizes electronic submission of physician assistant license applications & other required documentation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Assistants [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0056 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0837 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-55
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-23 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032
2010-04-22 Received -SJ 00753; Referred to Health Regulation; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00753; Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00743; Substituted for SB 1456 -SJ 00743; Read 2nd time -SJ 00743; Read 3rd time -SJ 00743; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00743
2010-04-21 In Messages
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -HJ 00799; CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00799
2010-04-20 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00777
2010-03-16 Favorable by- Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00312; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00312
2010-03-12 On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 03/16/10, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-04 Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00217; Now in Health & Family Services Policy Council
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00053; On Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 03/01/10, 3:15 pm, Morris Hall; CS by Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00172; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00162; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-01 CS by Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2010-02-22 On Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 03/01/10, 3:15 pm, Morris Hall
2010-01-20 Referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council
2010-01-05 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1456 (Similar To) 2010-04-22 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00743; Amendment(s) adopted (974650) -SJ 00743; Substituted CS/HB 573 -SJ 00743; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 573 (Ch. 2010-55) -SJ 00743

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0458347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0458348Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0459022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0459025Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback