FL H0569 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Pending: House Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes businesses to claim business damages from county or municipality if county or municipality enacts or amends certain ordinances or charter provisions; requires presuit procedures; authorizes recovery of costs & fees; specifies evidence relating to mediations & negotiations is inadmissible; requires courts to consider certain factors & follow specified guidance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Damages Caused by Local Governments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-13 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-18HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-18HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-14House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-01-14HouseCS Filed
2022-01-14HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2022-01-14HouseReported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseFavorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-11HouseAdded to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
2021-11-19HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-11-19HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-11-19HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-11-19HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-11-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S620 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7091Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback