FL H0569 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that cause of action for negligence or violation of residents' rights alleging direct or vicarious liability for injury or death of nursing home resident may be brought against licensee, its management or consulting company, its managing employees, & any direct caregiver employees or contractors; provides that claim for punitive damages may not be brought unless there is showing of evidence that provides a reasonable basis for recovery of such damages; authorizes AHCA to revoke license or deny license renewal or change of ownership application of nursing home facility that fails to pay judgment or settlement agreement; revises procedures for obtaining resident records.
Title
Nursing Home Litigation
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83) |
2014-04-22 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 670 |
2014-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/14 |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-24 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-21 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/21/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-12 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Innovation Subcommittee |
2014-03-10 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-05 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/11/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall --Temporarily deferred |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health Innovation Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0670 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-83
H0831 (Similar To) 2014-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
S1042 (Similar To) 2014-02-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
H0831 (Similar To) 2014-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
S1042 (Similar To) 2014-02-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0237 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |