FL H0567 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1006
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1006
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Designates strawberry shortcake with natural Florida dairy topping as official state dessert.
Title
Designation of the State Dessert
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1006 |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted CS/SB 1006 |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-01-28 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Reported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Favorable by Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda |
2021-11-19 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1006 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - Chapter No. 2022-12