FL H0567 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 886
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 886
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides deed containing single scrivener's error in description of real property may convey title despite such error if certain requirements are met, including filing of curative notice; specifies form of notice; provides for recording & operation of notice.
Title
Correction of Errors in Deeds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 886 |
2020-02-12 | House | Substituted SB 886 |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/12/20 |
2020-02-05 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/05/20 |
2020-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/23/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-17 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-16 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-11-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S886 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-33