FL H0563 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds certified 911 public safety telecommunicators to Special Risk Class; requires such members to have their benefits calculated in accordance with provisions for Regular Class members.
Title
Special Risk Class
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0898 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/563 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0563/BillText/Filed/PDF |