FL H0555 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that certain funds distributed into Land Acquisition Trust Fund be used for conservation & management projects in certain counties; provides types of projects for which DEP may use such funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Acquisition Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S376 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback