FL H0553 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information of person issued certificate of possession with respect to an assault weapon or large-capacity ammunition magazine; provides for access to exempt information for specified purposes; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Personal Identifying Information of Assault Weapon or Large-Capacity Magazine Possession Certificateholder

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H455 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S466 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S500 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
790321Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback