FL H0545 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each school district to locate all drinking water sources in certain schools, install barcode on each source, & install filters that meet certain specifications on all such sources; requires such schools to post certain signage on certain water sources & to publish specified information on school district's website.
Title
Drinking Water in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S66 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/545 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/545/BillText/Filed/PDF |