FL H0545 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00009; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Pending: House Rules & Calendar Council Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals provision requiring disclosures of residential property windstorm mitigation ratings to purchasers in wind-borne debris regions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Property Sales [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0012 - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Roll Call No. 0534 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-19 Veto Message received -HJ 00009; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
2010-06-01 Vetoed by Governor
2010-05-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-30 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01693
2010-04-30 Read 3rd time -SJ 01167; Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 -SJ 01167
2010-04-29 Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance -SJ 00995; Substituted for SB 2190 -SJ 00995; Read 2nd time -SJ 00995
2010-04-28 Received -SJ 00986; Referred to Banking and Insurance -SJ 00986
2010-03-16 In Messages
2010-03-10 Read 3rd time -HJ 00239; Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00239
2010-03-09 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00229
2010-03-03 Favorable by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00207; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00207
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council -HJ 00051; On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 02/03/10, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall; Favorable by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00168; Now in Policy Council -HJ 00168; On Council agenda-- Policy Council, 02/16/10, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall; Favorable by Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00169; Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00169; On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 03/03/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2010-03-01 On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 03/03/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2010-02-16 Favorable by Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0; Now in General Government Policy Council
2010-02-09 On Council agenda-- Policy Council, 02/16/10, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2010-02-04 Now in Policy Council
2010-02-03 Favorable by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2010-01-27 On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 02/03/10, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
2010-01-15 Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council
2009-12-28 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2190 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00995; Substituted HB 545 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00995; Laid on Table -SJ 00995

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0689262Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback