FL H0535 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "electronic dissemination".
Title
Electronic Dissemination of Commercial Recordings and Audiovisual Works
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#232 (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-21 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 1 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-04-06 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-30 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-26 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1542 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary