FL H0531 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Brevard County Supervisor of Elections to print party designation on ballots for all candidates for all elections; provides an exception; provides that only qualified electors of district, ward, precinct, or other geographical designation are eligible to vote in certain elections.
Title
Brevard County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-13 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-13 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-13 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | PCS added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-11-19 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-11-08 | House | Filed |