FL H0531 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-196
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-196
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases time period for granting or extending franchise, contract, or permit.
Title
Solid Waste Authority of Palm Beach County
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#315 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#315 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Chapter No. 2017-196 | |
2017-06-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 05/04/17 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2017-04-27 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 1 |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-22 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |