FL H0527 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 168 (Ch. 2019-102)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Designates act "Rule of Law Adherence Act"; prohibits sanctuary policies; requires state & local governmental agencies to use best efforts to support enforcement of federal immigration law; provides requirements concerning immigration detainers; requires AG to prescribe format for complaints; provides injunctive relief & civil penalties; prohibits expenditure of public funds for specified purposes; provides cause of action for personal injury or wrongful death attributed to sanctuary policy; prohibits discrimination on specified grounds; requires repeal of existing sanctuary policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Immigration Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#200 (Y: 69 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#199 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#190 (Y: 42 N: 67 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#189 (Y: 41 N: 69 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#188 (Y: 44 N: 65 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#187 (Y: 41 N: 66 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 168 (Ch. 2019-102)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-24SenateIn Messages
2019-04-24HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 69 NAYS 47
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23HouseAmendment(s) failed (055815, 056289, 070483, 280097, 337345, 341401, 503105, 576157, 580141, 584351, 661543, 688501, 696003, 737515, 768111, 828795, 969893) 786
2019-04-23HouseAmendment(s) adopted (172817, 358995) 782
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time 782
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-17HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-04-17HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-16HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-22HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-22HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2019-03-22HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-21HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-20HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3
2019-03-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S168 (Similar To) 2019-06-17 - Chapter No. 2019-102
S170 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 168 (Ch. 2019-102)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
908101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908402Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/420377/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/172817/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/341401/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/576157/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/278117/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/696003/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/280097/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/503105/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/661543/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/969893/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/580141/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/337345/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/494505/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/257953/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/029547/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/077323/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/229515/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/424615/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/584351/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/911185/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/031983/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/070483/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/828795/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/489875/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/370731/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/358995/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/688501/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/329611/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/714777/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/056289/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/638713/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/904993/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/589791/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/626039/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/813103/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/008393/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/169715/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/508515/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/055815/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/664615/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/897603/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/768111/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/529925/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/988755/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/737515/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/757203/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Amendment/029147/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Vote/HouseVote_h00527c2187.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Vote/HouseVote_h00527c2188.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Vote/HouseVote_h00527c2189.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Vote/HouseVote_h00527c2190.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Vote/HouseVote_h00527e1199.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/527/Vote/HouseVote_h00527e1200.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback