FL H0525 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1826 (Ch. 2021-189)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1826 (Ch. 2021-189)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides petition for human trafficking victim expungement & all pleadings & documents related to petition are confidential & exempt from public records requirements; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub.Rec./Petitions for Human Trafficking Victim Expungement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#132 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1826 (Ch. 2021-189) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-04-06 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-03-24 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-16 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H523 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1826 (Ch. 2021-189)
S1826 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-189
S1826 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-189