FL H0523 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-42)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-53
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for establishment & location of Florida Civil Rights Hall of Fame; provides for selection of hall-of-fame members by Governor upon recommendations by Florida Commission on Human Relations; provides criteria for such recommendations; authorizes commission to set time periods for nomination & selection of hall-of-fame members; assigns responsibility for certain hall-of-fame costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Civil Rights Hall of Fame [SPSC]

Sponsors

Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D]Rep. Janet Adkins [R]Rep. Kevin Ambler [R]Rep. Thomas Anderson [R]
Rep. Gary Aubuchon [R]Rep. Leonard Bembry [D]Rep. Mackenson Bernard [D]Sen. Ellyn Bogdanoff [R]
Rep. Esteban Bovo [R]Rep. Mary Brandenburg [D]Sen. Oscar Braynon [D]Rep. Ronald Brise [D]
Sen. Dwight Bullard [D]Rep. Rachel Burgin [R]Rep. James Bush [D]Rep. Dean Cannon [R]
Rep. Jennifer Carroll [R]Rep. Charles Chestnut [D]Rep. Gwyndolen Clarke-Reed [D]Rep. Larry Cretul [R]
Rep. Steve Crisafulli [R]Sen. Janet Cruz [D]Rep. Carl Domino [R]Rep. Chris Dorworth [R]
Rep. Brad Drake [R]Rep. Eric Eisnaugle [R]Sen. Greg Evers [R]Rep. Adam Fetterman [D]
Rep. Keith Fitzgerald [D]Sen. Anitere Flores [R]Rep. Clay Ford [R]Rep. Erik Fresen [R]
Rep. James Frishe [R]Sen. Bill Galvano [R]Rep. Luis Garcia [D]Rep. Joseph Gibbons [D]
Sen. Audrey Gibson [D]Rep. Richard Glorioso [R]Rep. Eduardo Gonzalez [R]Rep. Tom Grady [R]
Sen. Denise Grimsley [R]Rep. Adam Hasner [R]Sen. Alan Hays [R]Rep. Bill Heller [D]
Rep. Doug Holder [R]Rep. Edward Homan [R]Sen. Ed Hooper [R]Rep. Mike Horner [R]
Rep. Matt Hudson [R]Sen. Dorothy Hukill [R]Rep. Evan Jenne [D]Rep. Mia Jones [D]
Rep. Kurt Kelly [R]Rep. Martin Kiar [D]Rep. Rick Kriseman [D]Sen. John Legg [R]
Rep. Janet Long [D]Rep. Carlos Lopez-Cantera [R]Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R]Rep. Charles McBurney [R]
Rep. Seth McKeel [R]Rep. Peter Nehr [R]Rep. Bryan Nelson [R]Rep. Marlene O'Toole [R]
Rep. Mark Pafford [D]Rep. Jimmy Patronis [R]Rep. Pat Patterson [R]Rep. Scott Plakon [R]
Rep. Juan-carlos Planas [R]Rep. Ralph Poppell [R]Rep. Ari Porth [D]Rep. Stephen Precourt [R]
Rep. William Proctor [R]Sen. Kevin Rader [D]Rep. Lake Ray [R]Rep. Ron Reagan [R]
Rep. Betty Reed [D]Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D]Rep. David Rivera [R]Rep. Julio Robaina [R]
Rep. Kenneth Roberson [R]Rep. Yolly Roberson [D]Rep. Hazelle Rogers [D]Sen. Darryl Rouson [D]
Sen. Maria Sachs [D]Rep. Franklin Sands [D]Rep. Ron Saunders [D]Rep. Robert Schenck [R]
Rep. Ron Schultz [R]Rep. Elaine Schwartz [D]Rep. Kelly Skidmore [D]Rep. William Snyder [R]
Sen. Darren Soto [D]Sen. Kelli Stargel [R]Rep. Richard Steinberg [D]Rep. Dwayne Taylor [D]
Rep. Geraldine Thompson [D]Rep. Nicholas Thompson [R]Sen. Perry Thurston [D]Rep. John Tobia [R]
Rep. Baxter Troutman [R]Rep. James Waldman [D]Rep. Will Weatherford [R]Rep. Michael Weinstein [R]
Rep. Alan Williams [D]Rep. Trudi Williams [R]Rep. John Wood [R]Rep. Ritch Workman [R]
Rep. Juan Zapata [R]

Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0024 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House Roll Call No. 0894 - Cosponsor (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House Roll Call No. 0893 - Passage (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-53
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-27 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01177
2010-04-27 Withdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00917; Substituted for CS/SB 1354 -SJ 00917; Read 2nd time -SJ 00917; Read 3rd time -SJ 00917; CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 00917
2010-04-23 Received -SJ 00798; Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00798
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -HJ 00893; CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 -HJ 00894
2010-04-21 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00840
2010-04-17 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00761
2010-04-16 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00761
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-04-09 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00654
2010-04-07 CS read 1st time on 04/07/10 -HJ 00626; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-04-06 CS by Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00628
2010-04-02 On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC), 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 116-K
2010-03-25 Favorable by Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00406; Now in Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00406
2010-03-23 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/25/10, 9:00 am, 306-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00049
2010-01-15 Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-12-21 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1354 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00917; Substituted CS/HB 523 -SJ 00917; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 523 (Ch. 2010-53) -SJ 00917

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0760065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0523&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb052300.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb052301c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB05230422100893.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB05230422100894.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB05230427100024.html

Bill Comments

feedback