FL H0511 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires original equipment manufacturers of agricultural equipment to provide certain manufacturing, diagnostic, & repair information to independent repair providers & owners; prohibits original equipment manufacturers from excluding certain information concerning security-related functions; provides liability.
Title
Fair Repair of Agricultural Equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S374 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/511 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/511/BillText/Filed/PDF |