FL H0511 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises membership of Florida Cancer Control & Research Advisory Council; renames Florida Cancer Plan; requires statewide research plan; deletes council, Board of Governors, & State Surgeon General duties relating to awarding of grants & contracts for cancer-related programs; deletes council duties relating to development of written summaries of treatment alternatives; deletes financial aid provisions & Florida Cancer Control and Research Fund.
Title
Cancer Control and Research
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. Marti Coley [R] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
Sen. Dana Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#507 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#507 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-118 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 734 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2014-04-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-03-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14 |
2014-03-24 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-20 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/20/14, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-25 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-02-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-02-18 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/18/14, 9:00 am, 306 HOB |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0734 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 511 (Ch. 2014-118)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |