FL H0509 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates exception to suspension of civil rights upon conviction of felony for children convicted as adults; removes provisions requiring state attorney request court to transfer & certify child for prosecution as adult; revises factors that court must consider when determining whether child should be transferred to adult court; eliminates discretionary direct filing for children of specified ages; revises list of crimes for which children may be direct filed; requires specified information to be included in certain orders; removes provisions requiring that child be prosecuted as adult in certain circumstances; authorizes child transferred to adult court to request hearing; prohibits transfer of eligible child to adult court if child has previously been found incompetent & has not had competency restored; authorizes, rather than requires, court to order child to be housed in adult detention facility in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-08HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-11-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H195 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S936 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1552 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-86

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
944292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985565Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback