FL H0505 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises types of information relating to identity & location of child's legal father that fall within scope of court inquiry at dependency or shelter hearings or hearing regarding petition for termination of parental rights; provides conditions for establishing paternity in dependency proceeding; requires notice of petition for termination of parental rights to be served on unmarried biological father identified under oath or by diligent search of Florida Putative Father Registry; limits training requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dependency Proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Judiciary Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-05HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-31HouseCS/CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-31HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS/CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-24HouseNow in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
2018-01-18HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-17HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-08HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-11-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S774 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H1079 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-103
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1079

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091662Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63092Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback