FL H0501 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to propose to states an amendment to U.S. Constitution entitled "Regulation Freedom Amendment," which would require federal regulation be adopted by majority vote of both houses of Congress if opposed by specified percentage of membership of either house.
Title
Regulation Freedom Amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-10-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1064 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/501 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/501/BillText/Filed/PDF |