FL H0497 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Film, Television, & Digital Media Targeted Rebate Program within DEO; provides eligibility requirements & application procedures; requires Commissioner of Film & Entertainment to review applications & take certain actions; requires annual report to Governor & Legislature; provides for expiration of program & reversion of appropriated funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Entertainment Industry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-07HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-10-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S530 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2881259Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback