FL H0497 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes hospices, or providers operating under contract with hospice, to provide community palliative care to seriously ill patients & their families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospice Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-25HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-25HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-25HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-24HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-24HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-23HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 1:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-08HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-11-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S724 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4006005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4006093Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4006095Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback