FL H0493 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 606
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 606
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to boating collisions & accidents; liveries & livery permits; boating safety education courses; vessel registrations & title transfers; & related rules, fees, fines, & penalties.
Title
Boating Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 606 |
2022-03-04 | House | Substituted CS/SB 606 |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022) |
2022-02-28 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2022-02-25 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-16 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-16 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable with CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Original reference removed: Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-03 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | PCS added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-19 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-11-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S606 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |