FL H0493 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes representative of protected consumers to place security freeze; requires consumer reporting agency to establish record if necessary to institute security freeze; requires consumer reporting agency to place security freeze & provide written notification within specified period; prohibits consumer reporting agency from implying that security freeze reflects negative credit information; provides procedures for removal of security freeze; provides for applicability; authorizes fees; provides exemptions; provides for violations; provides for penalties & civil remedies; provides consumer reporting agency disclosure requirements for protected consumer security freeze.
Title
Security of Protected Consumer Information
Sponsors
House Regulatory Affairs Committee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Heather Fitzenhagen [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#154 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-04-11 | House | CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-09 | House | CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 10:30 am, 404 HOB |
2013-04-03 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-04-02 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-28 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/28/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-20 | House | Now in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2013-02-20 | House | Favorable by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 02/20/13, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0566 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary