FL H0493 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to rights of parents & public school students; prohibits use of corporal punishment as form of discipline; deletes provisions relating to authority of teachers & principals to administer corporal punishment; revises duties of district school boards & code of student conduct relating to control & discipline of students.
Title
Student Discipline in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 51 | |
2011-11-04 | Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 51 | |
2011-10-26 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 1251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/493 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0493/BillText/Filed/HTML |