FL H0493 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes creation of s. 28, Art. X of State Constitution to require election of members of governing boards that have authority to adopt millage rates; provides for implementing legislation that may include phase-in schedule; provides that transition to elected governing boards must be completed by January 1, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governing Boards/Election of Members

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00047; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall --Workshopped
2010-02-10 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall --Workshopped
2010-01-15 Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-12-15 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1180 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
01028Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback