FL H0491 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 346 (Ch. 2021-94)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 346 (Ch. 2021-94)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises composition of the board.
Title
Florida Real Estate Appraisal Board
Sponsors
House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | Rep. Lauren Melo [R] | Rep. Dianne Hart [D] | Rep. Daisy Morales [D] |
Rep. Allison Tant [D] | Rep. Susan Valdes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 346 (Ch. 2021-94) |
2021-04-20 | House | Substituted SB 346 |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-04-14 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-29 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-25 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | PCS added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S346 (Same As) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-94