FL H0491 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires FWCC, DACS,& DEP to coordinate certain duties & responsibilities to protect Florida black bears & to preserve their habitat; establishes Bear-Resistant Garbage Container Account within the Nongame Wildlife Trust Fund to aid local governments in purchasing such containers; prohibits certain activities in bear habitats; provides penalties; requires certifications for prescribed burns in such habitats.
Title
Florida Black Bears
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1304 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
379 | 3018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
590 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/491 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0491/BillText/Filed/PDF |