FL H0489 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the clerk of the value adjustment board to have available and distribute specified forms; authorizing the owner of multiple tangible personal property accounts to file a single joint petition with the value adjustment board under certain circumstances; providing that only a single filing fee may be charged for specified petitions to the value adjustment board with respect to real property parcels or tangible personal property accounts, etc.
Title
Value Adjustment Board Proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Chapter No. 2015-115 | |
2015-06-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-08 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 260 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Received |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-03-18 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (025977) |
2015-03-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/17/15 |
2015-03-09 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-06 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-05 | House | CS by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/05/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-12 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Favorable by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 02/12/15, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-01-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0260 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 489 (Ch. 2015-115)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
192 | 0105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |